Senate | 04/09/2024 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Burns |