Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3807 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2024

Amended

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill March 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024