House | 02/28/2024 | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Referred to Elections and Ethics | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Withdrawn from Elections and Ethics Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Dollens | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | First Reading |