Senate | 04/01/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Authored by Senator Newhouse (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Sims |