Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3819 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2024

Amended

Bill April 2, 2024
Bill March 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2024