Senate | 04/04/2024 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Sims |