Senate | 04/04/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 37 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization and Technology Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Technology | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval |