Senate | 04/04/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Pittman |