Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Remove Representative Kannady as principal House author and substitute with Representative Harris
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Remove Representative Ford as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kannady
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Ford
|
|
|