Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Coauthored by Representative CrosswhiteHader | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 16 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Authored by Senator Seifried (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Schreiber, Lepak, Sneed, Newton | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization and Technology Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Technology | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) |