House
|
04/23/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Chad)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Remove Representative Caldwell (Chad) as principal House author and substitute with Representative West (Tammy)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad)
|
|
|