Senate | 04/02/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 16 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Remove Representative Provenzano as principal House author and substitute with Representative Dollens | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Provenzano |