Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3958 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 7, 2024

Amended

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill February 22, 2024