Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3995 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2024

Amended

Bill March 26, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2024