Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3996 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 17, 2024

Amended

Bill April 8, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024