Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Conference granted, SCs named Hall, Rader, Howard, Pugh, Seifried, McCortney, Dossett
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Munson
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Remove Senator Pugh as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Hall
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore, Deck
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Menz
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative McBride
|
|
|