Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4013 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 13, 2024

Amended

Bill April 22, 2024
Bill March 3, 2024