Senate | 03/27/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Rogers | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Pittman | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 40 | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative McBride |