Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4044 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB4044 SFLR Page 1
4-(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1
3+ENGR. H. B. NO. 4044 Page 1 1
54 2
65 3
76 4
87 5
98 6
109 7
1110 8
1211 9
1312 10
1413 11
1514 12
1615 13
1716 14
1817 15
1918 16
2019 17
2120 18
2221 19
2322 20
2423 21
2524 22
2625 23
2726 24
2827
29-SENATE FLOOR VERSION
30-April 8, 2024
31-
32-
3328 ENGROSSED HOUSE
3429 BILL NO. 4044 By: McCall of the House
3530
3631 and
3732
3833 Treat of the Senate
34+
35+
3936
4037
4138
4239
4340 An Act relating to revenue and taxation; providing
4441 procedures for compliance with certain tax laws;
4542 authorizing waiver of p enalty and interest;
4643 specifying tax types with respect to which wavier
4744 allowable; imposing limitations and conditions on
4845 taxpayer participation; prescribing procedures;
4946 providing for administrative rules; restric ting
5047 procedures based upon status as appointed or elected
5148 official; authorizing utilization of procedures
5249 notwithstanding statutory provisions; providing for
5350 codification; and providing an effective date .
5451
5552
5653
54+
55+
5756 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA:
5857 SECTION 1. NEW LAW A new section of l aw to be codified
5958 in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 216.6 of Title 68, unless there
6059 is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows:
6160 A. For the purpose of encouraging the vol untary disclosure and
6261 payment of taxes owed to this state, the Oklahoma Tax Commission is
6362 hereby authorized and directed to establish a Voluntary Disclosure
6463 Initiative for eligible taxes, as provided in this sec tion. A
6564 taxpayer shall be entitled to a waiv er of penalty, interest and
6665 other collection fees due on eligible taxes if the taxpayer
6766
68-SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB4044 SFLR Page 2
69-(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1
67+ENGR. H. B. NO. 4044 Page 2 1
7068 2
7169 3
7270 4
7371 5
7472 6
7573 7
7674 8
7775 9
7876 10
7977 11
8078 12
8179 13
8280 14
8381 15
8482 16
8583 17
8684 18
8785 19
8886 20
8987 21
9088 22
9189 23
9290 24
9391
9492 voluntarily files delin quent tax returns and pays the taxes due
9593 during the disclosure initiative. The time in which a volu ntary
9694 payment of tax liability may be made or the taxpayer may enter into
9795 a payment program acceptable to the Tax Co mmission for payment of
9896 the unpaid taxes in full in the manner and time established in a
9997 written payment program agreement between the Tax C ommission and the
10098 taxpayer under the Voluntar y Disclosure Initiative shall be
10199 applicable with respect to the enumerated tax types in this section
102100 for all periods beginning January 1, 2020, and ending December 31 ,
103101 2024 and the taxpayer shall be required to make application to the
104102 Tax Commission during the period beginning January 1, 2025, and
105103 ending December 31, 2025.
106104 B. Upon payment of the eligible taxes under the Voluntary
107105 Disclosure Initiative established, the Tax Comm ission shall abate
108106 and not seek to coll ect any interest, penalties or collection fees
109107 that would otherwise be applicable.
110108 C. As used in this section, " eligible taxes" shall include the
111109 following taxes that were due and payable for the tax period or
112110 periods prescribed by subsection A of this se ction before entering
113111 into an agreement as provided in the initiative:
114112 1. Mixed beverage tax levied pursuant to Section 576 of Title
115113 37 of the Oklahoma Statutes;
116114 2. Gasoline and diesel tax levied pursuant to Sec tion 500.4 of
117115 Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes;
118116
119-SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB4044 SFLR Page 3
120-(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1
117+ENGR. H. B. NO. 4044 Page 3 1
121118 2
122119 3
123120 4
124121 5
125122 6
126123 7
127124 8
128125 9
129126 10
130127 11
131128 12
132129 13
133130 14
134131 15
135132 16
136133 17
137134 18
138135 19
139136 20
140137 21
141138 22
142139 23
143140 24
144141
145142 3. Gross production and petroleum e xcise tax levied pursuant to
146143 Sections 1001, 1101 and 1102 of Title 68 o f the Oklahoma Statutes;
147144 4. Sales tax levied pursuant to Section 1354 of Title 68 of the
148145 Oklahoma Statutes;
149146 5. Use tax levied pursuant to Section 1402 of Title 68 of the
150147 Oklahoma Statutes;
151148 6. Income tax levied pursuant to Section 2355 of Title 68 of
152149 the Oklahoma Statutes; and
153150 7. Withholding tax levied p ursuant to Section 2385.2 of Title
154151 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes .
155152 D. To be eligible to participate in this initiative, taxpayers
156153 must:
157154 1. Not have collected taxes from others, such as sales and use
158155 taxes or payroll taxes, and not reported those taxes; and
159156 2. Not have, within the preceding three (3) year s, entered into
160157 a voluntary disclosure agreement fo r the type of tax owed.
161158 E. If the Tax Commission agrees with the propos ed terms for
162159 payment of the principal amount of tax due and owing, the penalties
163160 and interest otherwise imposed by law upon the princ ipal amount
164161 shall be waived by operation of law and no further action by the Tax
165162 Commission or by the taxpayer shall be required for the waiver o f
166163 such penalty and applicable interest.
167164 F. The Tax Commission shall limit the period for which
168165 additional taxes may be assessed to three (3) taxable years for
169166
170-SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB4044 SFLR Page 4
171-(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1
167+ENGR. H. B. NO. 4044 Page 4 1
172168 2
173169 3
174170 4
175171 5
176172 6
177173 7
178174 8
179175 9
180176 10
181177 11
182178 12
183179 13
184180 14
185181 15
186182 16
187183 17
188184 18
189185 19
190186 20
191187 21
192188 22
193189 23
194190 24
195191
196192 annually filed taxes or thirty -six (36) months for taxes that do not
197193 have an annual filing frequency.
198194 G. Taxpayers who meet all of the qualifications specifi ed in
199195 subsection D of this section, except those who have collected taxes
200196 from others, such as sales and use taxes or payroll taxes, and not
201197 reported those taxes, may enter into a modified volun tary disclosure
202198 agreement.
203199 H. The provisions of a modified vo luntary disclosure agreement
204200 shall be the same as a voluntary disclosure agreement as specified
205201 in subsection E of this section; prov ided, the waiver of interest
206202 shall not apply except as may be optionall y granted at the
207203 discretion of the Tax Commission, and the period for which taxes
208204 must be reported and remitted or assessed is extended beyond the
209205 three-year or thirty-six-month period provided in subsection F of
210206 this section to include all perio ds in which tax has been collected
211207 but not remitted.
212208 I. The waiver of penalty and interest provided herein is fully
213209 effective provided taxpayer continues payment or collection and
214210 remittance of applicable taxes, as required by law, f or a period of
215211 one (1) year after the tax period(s) for which taxes were paid
216212 pursuant to this initiative.
217213 J. The Tax Commission is authorized to expend necessary
218214 available funds, inc luding contracting with third par ties, to
219215 publicly advertise, assist in the collection of elig ible taxes, and
220216
221-SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB4044 SFLR Page 5
222-(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1
217+ENGR. H. B. NO. 4044 Page 5 1
223218 2
224219 3
225220 4
226221 5
227222 6
228223 7
229224 8
230225 9
231226 10
232227 11
233228 12
234229 13
235230 14
236231 15
237232 16
238233 17
239234 18
240235 19
241236 20
242237 21
243238 22
244239 23
245240 24
246241
247242 administer the Voluntary Disclosure Initiative and shall be exempt
248243 from the provisions of Secti on 85.7 of Title 74 of the Oklahoma
249244 Statutes for the purpose of implementing this se ction.
250245 K. The Tax Commission is author ized to promulgate rules
251246 detailing the terms and other conditions of this program .
252247 L. The provisions of this section shall not be applicable to
253248 any person appointed to or elected to a public office.
254249 M. A taxpayer may utilize the procedures described by this
255250 section notwithstanding the provisions of Section 216.5 of Title 68
256251 of the Oklahoma Statutes.
257252 SECTION 2. This act shall become effective November 1, 2024.
258-COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON FINANCE
259-April 8, 2024 - DO PASS
253+Passed the House of Representatives the 12th day of March, 2024.
254+
255+
256+
257+
258+ Presiding Officer of the House
259+ of Representatives
260+
261+
262+
263+Passed the Senate the ___ day of __________, 2024.
264+
265+
266+
267+
268+ Presiding Officer of the Senate
269+
270+