Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4044 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 04/09/2024

                             
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB4044 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
April 8, 2024 
 
 
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 4044 	By: McCall of the House 
 
  and 
 
  Treat of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to revenue and taxation; providing 
procedures for compliance with certain tax laws; 
authorizing waiver of penalty and interest; 
specifying tax types with respect to which wavier 
allowable; imposing limitations and conditions on 
taxpayer participation; prescribing procedures; 
providing for administrative rules; restricting 
procedures based upon status as appointed or e lected 
official; authorizing utilization of procedures 
notwithstanding statutory provisions; providing for 
codification; and providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 216.6 of Title 68, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  For the purpose of encouraging the voluntary disclosure and 
payment of taxes owed to this sta te, the Oklahoma Tax Commission is 
hereby authorized and directed to establish a Voluntary Disclosure 
Initiative for eligible taxes, as provided in this section.  A 
taxpayer shall be entitled to a waiver of penalty, interest and 
other collection fees due o n eligible taxes if the taxpayer   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB4044 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
voluntarily files delinquent tax returns and pays the taxes due 
during the disclosure initiative.  The time in which a voluntary 
payment of tax liability may be made or the taxpayer may enter into 
a payment program acceptab le to the Tax Commission for payment of 
the unpaid taxes in full in the manner and time established in a 
written payment program agreement between the Ta x Commission and the 
taxpayer under the Voluntary Disclosure Initiative shall be 
applicable with respec t to the enumerated tax types in this section 
for all periods beginning January 1, 2020, and ending December 31, 
2024 and the taxpayer shall be required to make application to the 
Tax Commission during the period beginning January 1, 2025, and 
ending December 31, 2025. 
B.  Upon payment of the eligible taxes under the Voluntary 
Disclosure Initiative established, the Tax Commission shall abate 
and not seek to collect any interest, penalties or collection fees 
that would otherwise be applicable. 
C.  As used in this section, "eligible taxes" shall include the 
following taxes that were due and payable for the tax period or 
periods prescribed by subsection A of this section before entering 
into an agreement as provided in the initiative: 
1.  Mixed beverage tax lev ied pursuant to Section 576 of Title 
37 of the Oklahoma Statutes; 
2.  Gasoline and diesel tax levied pursuant to Section 500.4 of 
Title 68 of the Oklahom a Statutes;   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB4044 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
3.  Gross production and petroleum excise tax levied pursuant to 
Sections 1001, 1101 and 11 02 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes; 
4.  Sales tax levied pursuant to Section 1354 of Title 68 of the 
Oklahoma Statutes; 
5.  Use tax levied pursuant to Section 1402 of Title 68 of the 
Oklahoma Statutes; 
6.  Income tax levied pursuant to Section 2355 of Title 68 of 
the Oklahoma Statutes; and 
7.  Withholding tax levied pursuant to Section 2385.2 of Title 
68 of the Oklahoma Statutes. 
D.  To be eligible to participate in this initiative, taxpayers 
must: 
1.  Not have collected taxes from others, such as sale s and use 
taxes or payroll taxes, and not reported those taxes; and 
2.  Not have, within the preceding three (3) years, entered into 
a voluntary disclosure agreement for the type of tax owed. 
E.  If the Tax Commission agrees with the proposed terms for 
payment of the principal amount of tax due and owing, the penalties 
and interest otherwise imposed by law upon the principal amount 
shall be waived by opera tion of law and no further action by the Tax 
Commission or by the taxpayer shall be required for the wa iver of 
such penalty and applicable interest. 
F.  The Tax Commission shall limit the period for which 
additional taxes may be assessed to three (3) taxable years for   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB4044 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
annually filed taxes or thirty -six (36) months for taxes that do not 
have an annual filing frequency. 
G.  Taxpayers who meet all of the qualifications specified in 
subsection D of this section, except those who have collected taxes 
from others, such as sales and use taxes or payroll taxes, and not 
reported those taxes, may enter into a modified voluntary disclosure 
agreement. 
H.  The provisions of a modified voluntary disclosure agreement 
shall be the same as a voluntary disclosure agreement as specified 
in subsection E of this section; provided, the waiver of interest 
shall not apply except as may be optionally granted at the 
discretion of the Tax Commission, and the period for which taxes 
must be reported and remitted or assessed is extended b eyond the 
three-year or thirty-six-month period provided in subsection F of 
this section to include all periods in which tax has been collected 
but not remitted. 
I.  The waiver of penalty and interest provided herein is fully 
effective provided taxpayer continues payment or collection and 
remittance of applicable taxes, as required by law, for a period of 
one (1) year after the tax period(s) for which taxes were paid 
pursuant to this initiative. 
J.  The Tax Commission is authorized to expend necessary 
available funds, including contracting with third parties, to 
publicly advertise, assist in the collection o f eligible taxes, and   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB4044 SFLR 	Page 5 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
administer the Voluntary Disclosure Initiative and shall be exempt 
from the provisions of Section 85.7 of Title 74 of the Oklahoma 
Statutes for the purpose of implementing this section. 
K.  The Tax Commission is authorized to promulga te rules 
detailing the terms and other conditions of this program. 
L.  The provisions of this section shall not be applicable to 
any person appointed to or elected to a public office. 
M.  A taxpayer may utilize the procedures described by this 
section notwithstanding the provisions of Section 216.5 of Title 68 
of the Oklahoma Statutes. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2024. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON FINANCE 
April 8, 2024 - DO PASS