Senate | 04/08/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 10 | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Wallace |