Senate | 04/11/2024 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Remove as author Senator Hall; authored by Senator Garvin | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 7 | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sims | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Wallace |