Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4070 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024