House
|
04/23/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Caldwell (Trey)
|
|
|