Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Munson | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 11 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Authored by Senator Hicks (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Talley |