Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Deevers, Jett, Alvord
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pfeiffer, CrosswhiteHader, Luttrell, Wolfley, Banning, Patzkowsky, Echols, Conley, Smith, Kane, Fetgatter, Roberts, Sneed, May, Lepak, West (Josh), Hays
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom, Hamilton, Prieto, Dahm, Newhouse, Burns
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Kevin), McDugle, Hilbert, Boles, Hardin, Gann, Steagall, Cantrell, Grego, West (Rick), Maynard, Kendrix, Duel, Sims
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Remove Representative West (Kevin) as principal House author and substitute with Representative McCall
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative West (Kevin)
|
|
|