Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Rosecrants
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Waldron
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Schreiber
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Sims
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Dollens, Wallace, McDugle, Hasenbeck, Baker, Fugate, Provenzano, Boles
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Maynard
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appr/Sub-Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Dick) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|