Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB101 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023