Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB101 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/23/2023

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB101 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
February 22, 2023 
AS AMENDED 
 
SENATE BILL NO. 101 	By: Pemberton, Garvin, Weaver, 
and Bullard of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Lowe (Dick) of the House 
 
 
 
 
[ school security - appropriation - eligibility - 
report - noncodification - effective date -  
 	emergency ] 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE O F OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law not to be 
codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: 
A.  There is hereby appropriated t o the Oklahoma Department of 
Emergency Management from any monies not otherwise approp riated from 
the General Revenue Fund of the State Treasury for the fiscal year 
ending June 30, 2024, the sum of Twenty Mil lion Dollars 
($20,000,000.00) or so much thereof as may be necessary to be 
deposited in the Oklahoma School Security Revolving Fund created 
pursuant to Section 51.2c of Title 74 of the Oklahoma Statutes to 
administer the Oklahoma Sc hool Security Grant Program created 
pursuant to Section 51.2b of Title 7 4 of the Oklahoma Statutes.   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB101 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
B.  Of the funds appropriated pursuant to subsection A of this 
section: 
1.  Eighty-five percent (85%) shall be used to provide Oklahoma 
School Security Grant Program grants to public schools, technology 
center schools, and private schools; and 
2.  Fifteen percent (15%) shall be used to provide Oklahoma 
School Security Grant Program grants to institutions of higher 
learning. 
SECTION 2.     AMENDATORY     74 O.S. 2021 , Section 51.2b, as 
amended by Section 5, Chapter 302, O.S.L. 2022 (74 O.S. Supp. 2022, 
Section 51.2b), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 51.2b. A.  This section shall be known and may be cited 
as the “Oklahoma School Security Grant Program Act”. 
B.  The Oklahoma Department of Emergency Management shall 
solicit proposals for and make gra nts for the enhancement of campus 
security at institutions of higher learning, technology center 
schools, public schools, and private schools. 
C.  The goals and objectives of the Oklahoma School S ecurity 
Grant Program are to: 
1.  Increase the awareness of the public and educational 
institutions of the ris ks, threats, and vulnerabilities of school 
campuses as well as mitigation strategies;   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB101 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  Incentivize participation in school security training 
programs designed to assess campus risks, threats, and 
vulnerabilities; 
3.  Provide assistance to institutions o f higher learning, 
technology center schools, public schools , and private schools 
initiating or implement ing school security plans, programs, and 
activities; and 
4. Build upon the success of the pilot Educ ation Grant Program 
established by the Oklahoma Of fice of Homeland Security. 
D.  The Department shall determine grant pro ject criteria and 
establish a process for the consideration of prop osals.  The 
proposals shall be considered on a statewide competitive basis among 
peer institutions. To be eligible for a n Oklahoma School Secu rity 
Grant Program award, an institution of higher learning, technology 
center school, publi c school, or private school s hall: 
1.  Have undergone a risk and vulnerability assessment conducted 
by the Oklahoma School Security Institute; and 
2.  Agree to expend grant funds on items recommended by the risk 
and vulnerability assessment and/or to provide behavioral threat 
assessment and management training to employees. 
E.  On or before January 1, 2010, and each year thereafter, the 
Department shall prepare an annual report on the Oklaho ma School 
Security Grant Program and submit the report to the Governor, the 
President Pro Tempore of the Senate , and the Speaker of the House of   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB101 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Representatives. The report shall include a list of the recipients 
of Oklahoma School Security Grant Program awards and inf ormation on 
how grant funds were used during the previous year. 
SECTION 3.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2023. 
SECTION 4.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health , or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof thi s act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS 
February 22, 2023 - DO PASS AS AMENDED