Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1054 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/19/2023

                             
 
 
Req. No. 130 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
SENATE BILL 1054 	By: Stanley 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to soldiers and sailors; ame nding 72 
O.S. 2021, Section 63.2, which relates to membe rs of 
the Oklahoma Veterans Commission; modifying procedure 
by which Commissioners are selected; requiring the 
Governor to publicly announce Commission openings; 
providing procedure for filling vacancies; and 
providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     72 O.S. 2021, Section 63.2, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 63.2. The Oklahoma Veterans Commission shal l consist of 
nine (9) members, all of whom shall be honorably discharged United 
States veterans; provided, one of the members shall be a veteran of 
the Vietnam Conflict and two shall be veterans of the Pe rsian Gulf 
Wars.  The After the effective date of this act, the members shall 
be selected in the following manner:  The state executive board or 
committees of the veterans’ organizations named in this section 
shall that have representation in this state may each submit to the 
Governor a list of five persons they determine are qualified to   
 
 
Req. No. 130 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
serve as members of the Oklahoma Veterans Commission.  All The 
Governor shall work with the Secretary of Veteran Affairs and 
Military to ensure appointments shall be broa dly representative of 
the veterans of this state in t erms of age, gender, and race or 
ethnicity.  The list shall be submitted to the G overnor The Governor 
shall release an announcement of upcoming openings of the Commission 
twelve (12) months prior to vacancy of each seat.  At that time, 
interested organizations shall be able to submit a list of qualified 
candidates not later than three (3) months prior to the expiration 
of the terms of office of the members of the Oklahoma Veterans 
Commission.  The Governor shall name one member from each of the 
following Veterans’ groups select the most qualified can didates from 
any of the various Veter ans Service Organizations that are in good 
standing and have representation, within this state.  Organizations 
or groups submitting names may include but are not limited to :  the 
American Legion; the Veterans of Foreign Wars; the Disabled American 
Veterans; the Paralyzed Veterans of America ; the Military Order of 
the Purple Heart; Team Red, White, and Blue ; Team Rubicon; Student 
Veterans of America; The Mission Continues ; the Military Officers 
Association of America; and the National Guard Association of 
Oklahoma.  The members representing the American Legion and the 
Paralyzed Veterans of America s hall take office no later than July 
1, 2015.  The members representing the Veteran s of Foreign Wars and 
the Military Order of the Purple Heart shall take office no later   
 
 
Req. No. 130 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
than July 1, 2016.  The members representing the Disabled Amer ican 
Veterans and the National Guard Association o f Oklahoma shall take 
office no later than July 1, 2017.  The Governor shall may also 
appoint up to three members at large. 
The In order to be eligible to submit a list of candidates for 
the Oklahoma Veterans Commission to the Governor for consideration, 
the executive officer of each veterans ’ organization operating 
within this state shall, on or before January 1 of the each year in 
which the organization ’s appointee’s term expires, submit to the 
Secretary of State, the Governor, the President Pro Tempore o f the 
Senate, and the Speaker of the House of Representa tives, the chair 
of the Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee, and the chair 
of the House of Representatives Veterans and Military Affairs 
Committee, a copy of the performance audit and the f inancial audit 
of the his or her organization for the im mediately preceding fiscal 
year of the organization.  Such audits shall be conducted in 
accordance with auditing standards generally accepted in the United 
States and shall clearly show the total paid membe rship of the 
organization and shall be certified t o by a certified public 
accountant.  Failure to comply with this section shall render the 
organization ineligible to submit a nominee to the Governor.  The 
members of the Commission shall be appointed by th e Governor with 
advice and consent of the Senate, and shall serve at the pleasure of 
the Governor.  When a vacancy on the Oklahoma Veterans Commission   
 
 
Req. No. 130 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
occurs, the organization organizations which is represented by the 
vacant position shall are eligible as defined in this section may 
submit a list of five up to three names to the Governor.  The 
Governor shall may choose a replacement from that list.  No person 
shall be appointed by the Governor who is related by affinity or 
consanguinity within the third deg ree to any person employed by the 
Oklahoma Department of Veterans Affairs. 
Before any member app ointed as provided herein shall enter upon 
his or her duties as a member of the Commission, he or she shall 
take and subscribe to the oath of office as required by the 
Constitution of this state. 
Present members of the Commission shall continue in office u ntil 
the expiration of their terms and until their successors are 
appointed and enter upon the duties of their offices.  Appointments 
shall be made for a three -year period.  Any vacancy on the 
Commission resulting from any cause shall be filled by appointm ent 
by the Governor for the remainder of the term as provided in this 
section. 
No member of the Oklahoma Veter ans Commission shall be employed 
by the Oklahoma Department of Veterans Affairs during the time of 
his or her service on the Oklahoma Veterans Com mission nor shall any 
person who served as a member of the Oklahoma Veterans Commission be 
employed by the Oklahoma Department of Veterans Affairs subsequent   
 
 
Req. No. 130 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
to his or her service on the Commission for a period of two (2) 
years. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2023. 
 
59-1-130 KR 1/19/2023 1:06:14 PM