Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Approved by Governor 06/14/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
JCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Thompson (Roger); authored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Trey)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
remove as coauthor Representative(s) Martinez
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Martinez
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger)
|
|
|