Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 29
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Rosecrants
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter, Pae, Bashore, Randleman, Townley, Cantrell, Boles, Hill
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Alvord, Boren, Coleman, Garvin, Jett, Pemberton, Prieto, Rogers, Stanley, Stewart, Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Hardin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Dugger
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|