Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1200 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2024

Amended

Bill April 8, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024