House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Coauthored by Representative May (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Prieto |