Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Approved by Governor 03/05/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Olsen
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Gollihare
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts, Wolfley, Manger
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Withdrawn from Finance committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Hill
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Maynard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Stark
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Talley
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Boles
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Menz
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|