Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1215 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 4, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill February 29, 2024

Amended

Bill February 23, 2024
Bill February 12, 2024