Senate | 05/01/2024 | Approved by Governor 05/01/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Swope | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) |