Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1243 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 20, 2024