Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB126 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 23, 2023