Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
SCs named McCortney, Pemberton, Jett, Coleman, Dugger, Garvin, Matthews
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator McCortney
|
|
|