Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1272 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-ENGR. H. A. to ENGR. S. B. NO. 1272 Page 1 1
3+SB1272 HFLR Page 1
4+BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
45 2
56 3
67 4
78 5
89 6
910 7
1011 8
1112 9
1213 10
1314 11
1415 12
1516 13
1617 14
1718 15
1819 16
1920 17
2021 18
2122 19
2223 20
2324 21
2425 22
2526 23
2627 24
2728
28-ENGROSSED HOUSE AMENDME NT
29- TO
30-ENGROSSED SENATE BILL NO . 1272 By: McCortney of the Senate
29+HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION
3130
32- and
31+STATE OF OKLAHOMA
3332
34- Sneed of the House
35-
36-
37-
38-
39-
40-[ Oklahoma Employees Insurance and Benefits Act -
41-Reserve Fund - approval - notification - reporting -
42-effective date -
43- emergency ]
44-
45-
46-
47-
48-AMENDMENT NO. 1. Page 1, line 10, strike the enacting clause
49-
50-Passed the House of Representatives the 17th day of April, 2024.
51-
52-
53-
54-
55-
56-Presiding Officer of the House of
57- Representatives
58-
59-
60-Passed the Senate the ____ day of _______ ___, 2024.
61-
62-
63-
64-
65-
66-Presiding Officer of the Senate
67-
68-
69-ENGR. S. B. NO. 1272 Page 1 1
70-2
71-3
72-4
73-5
74-6
75-7
76-8
77-9
78-10
79-11
80-12
81-13
82-14
83-15
84-16
85-17
86-18
87-19
88-20
89-21
90-22
91-23
92-24
33+2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024)
9334
9435 ENGROSSED SENATE
9536 BILL NO. 1272 By: McCortney of the Senate
9637
9738 and
9839
9940 Sneed of the House
10041
10142
10243
10344
10445 [ Oklahoma Employees Insurance and Benefits Act -
10546 Reserve Fund - approval - notification - reporting -
10647 effective date -
10748 emergency ]
10849
10950
11051
11152
11253 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOP LE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA:
11354 SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 74 O.S. 2021, Section 1312, is
11455 amended to read as follows:
11556 Section 1312. (1) A. Except as otherwise provided by law, all
11657 employee and employer contributions, appropriations and dividend
11758 payments related to the health and dental plans administered by the
11859 Director of the Office of Management and Enterprise Services (OMES)
11960 shall be deposited in a fund in the State Treasury which is hereby
12061 created and which shall be known as the Health and Dental Insurance
12162 Reserve Fund “Health and Dental Insurance Reserve Fund ”. The money
12263 in such fund shall be invested by the Oklahoma Employees In surance
12364 and Benefits Board in the manner specified in Section 1305.1 of this
124-title. Investment income of the fund shall be added to the fund.
125-Money payable to the claims administrator and all expenses in
12665
127-ENGR. S. B. NO. 1272 Page 2 1
66+SB1272 HFLR Page 2
67+BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
12868 2
12969 3
13070 4
13171 5
13272 6
13373 7
13474 8
13575 9
13676 10
13777 11
13878 12
13979 13
14080 14
14181 15
14282 16
14383 17
14484 18
14585 19
14686 20
14787 21
14888 22
14989 23
15090 24
15191
92+title. Investment income of the fund shall be added to the fund.
93+Money payable to the claims administrator and all expenses in
15294 connection with the plans shall be paid from the f und. The Board
15395 shall have responsibility for management of the fund.
15496 (2) B. All monies in the Health an d Dental Insurance Reserve
15597 Fund that are reserves for the life insurance plan administered by
15698 the Office OMES shall be transferred to the Life Insuranc e Reserve
15799 Fund on July 1, 1989.
158100 C. 1. For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025, and each
159101 fiscal year thereafter, OMES shall maintain and record the internal
160102 benchmark for funds necessary to operate the state -administered
161103 plans to be held in the Health and Dental Insurance Reserve Fund.
162104 2. For the purposes of this section, “internal benchmark” means
163105 the National Association of Insurance Commissioners recommended
164106 calculation for risk -based capital plus the previous ten (10) years ’
165107 average for claims and in vestment losses.
166108 D. 1. Any funds in excess of the limitations set forth in
167109 subsection C of this section shall be spent to lower premiums and
168110 health insurance costs pursuant to the schedule prescribed in
169111 paragraph 2 of this subsection . A clear and concis e statement of
170112 how cost savings are implemented for the plan year shall be provided
171113 to all enrollees.
172-2. Funds in excess of the internal benchmark shall be spent in
173-accordance with paragraph 1 of this subsection pursuant to the
174-following schedule:
175114
176-ENGR. S. B. NO. 1272 Page 3 1
115+SB1272 HFLR Page 3
116+BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
177117 2
178118 3
179119 4
180120 5
181121 6
182122 7
183123 8
184124 9
185125 10
186126 11
187127 12
188128 13
189129 14
190130 15
191131 16
192132 17
193133 18
194134 19
195135 20
196136 21
197137 22
198138 23
199139 24
200140
141+2. Funds in excess of the internal benchmark shall be spent in
142+accordance with paragraph 1 of this subsection pursuant to the
143+following schedule:
201144 a. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2025, twenty
202145 percent (20%) of the monies exceeding the reported
203146 internal benchmark,
204147 b. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2026, forty
205148 percent (40%) of the monies exceeding the reported
206149 internal benchmark,
207150 c. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2027, sixty
208151 percent (60%) of the monies excee ding the reported
209152 internal benchmark,
210153 d. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2028, eighty
211154 percent (80%) of the monies exceeding the reported
212155 internal benchmark, and
213156 e. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2029, and each
214157 plan year thereafter, one hundred percent (100%) of
215158 the monies exceeding the reported internal benchmark.
216159 E. Beginning January 1, 2026, and each year thereafter, OMES
217160 shall electronically issue an annual report to the President Pro
218161 Tempore of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Rep resentatives,
219162 and the Oklahoma Employees Insurance and Benefits Board not later
220163 than July 1 containing the following information regarding all
221164 state-administered plans:
222-1. Reserve amounts for the previous five (5) fiscal years;
223-2. Current operating expen ses;
224165
225-ENGR. S. B. NO. 1272 Page 4 1
166+SB1272 HFLR Page 4
167+BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
226168 2
227169 3
228170 4
229171 5
230172 6
231173 7
232174 8
233175 9
234176 10
235177 11
236178 12
237179 13
238180 14
239181 15
240182 16
241183 17
242184 18
243185 19
244186 20
245187 21
246188 22
247189 23
248190 24
249191
192+1. Reserve amounts for the previous five (5) fiscal years;
193+2. Current operating expenses ;
250194 3. Premium rates for enr ollees of each plan for the previous
251195 five (5) plan years;
252196 4. An explanation of all premium decreases, increases, and cost
253197 savings realized by enrollee s for the current plan year ; and
254198 5. Any other information deemed necessary by the Board.
255199 SECTION 2. This act shall become effective July 1, 2024.
256200 SECTION 3. It being immediately necessary for the preservation
257201 of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby
258202 declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall tak e effect and
259203 be in full force from and after its passage and approval.
260-Passed the Senate the 1 4th day of March, 2024.
261204
262-
263-
264- Presiding Officer of the Senate
265-
266-
267-Passed the House of Representatives the ____ day of __________,
268-2024.
269-
270-
271-
272- Presiding Officer of the House
273- of Representatives
274-
275-
205+COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS AND BUDGET, dated
206+04/11/2024 - DO PASS, As Amended.