SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1272 SFLR Page 1 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 SENATE FLOOR VERSION February 28, 2024 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR SENATE BILL NO. 1272 By: McCortney of the Senate and Sneed of the House [ Oklahoma Employees Insurance and Benefits Act - Reserve Fund - approval - notification - reporting - effective date - emergency ] BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 74 O.S. 2021, Section 1312, is amended to read as follows: Section 1312. (1) A. Except as otherwise provided by law, all employee and employer contributions, appropriations and dividend payments related to the health and dental plans administered by the Director of the Office of Management and Enterprise Services (OMES) shall be deposited in a fund in the State Treasury whi ch is hereby created and which shall be known as the Health and Dental Insurance Reserve Fund “Health and Dental Ins urance Reserve Fund”. The money in such fund shall be invested by the Oklahoma Employees I nsurance and Benefits Board in the manner specified in Section 1305.1 of this SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1272 SFLR Page 2 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 title. Investment income of the fund shall be added to th e fund. Money payable to the claims administrator and all expenses in connection with the plans shall be paid from the fund. The Board shall have responsibility for ma nagement of the fund. (2) B. All monies in the Health and Dental Insurance Reserve Fund that are reserves for the life insurance plan a dministered by the Office OMES shall be transferred to the Life Insurance Reser ve Fund on July 1, 1989. C. 1. For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025, and each fiscal year thereafter, OMES shall maintain and record the internal benchmark for funds necessary to operate the stat e-administered plans to be held in the Health and Dental Insurance Reserve Fund . 2. For the purposes of this section, “internal benchmark” means the National Association of Insurance Commissioners recommended calculation for risk-based capital plus the previous ten (10) years’ average for claims and investment losses. D. 1. Any funds in excess of the limitations set forth in subsection C of this section shall be spent to lower premiums and health insurance costs pursuant to the schedule prescribed in paragraph 2 of this subsection. A clear and concise statement of how cost savings are implemented for the plan year shall be provided to all enrollees. SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1272 SFLR Page 3 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 2. Funds in excess of the internal benchma rk shall be spent in accordance with paragraph 1 of this s ubsection pursuant to the following schedule: a. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2025, twenty percent (20%) of the monies exceeding the reported internal benchmark, b. for the plan year beginning January 1, 202 6, forty percent (40%) of the monies exceeding the reported internal benchmark, c. for the plan year beginning January 1, 202 7, sixty percent (60%) of the monies exceeding the reported internal benchmark, d. for the plan year beginning Janu ary 1, 2028, eighty percent (80%) of the monies exceeding the reported internal benchmark, and e. for the plan year beginning January 1, 202 9, and each plan year thereafter, one hundred percent (100%) of the monies exceeding the reported internal benchmark. E. Beginning January 1, 2026, and each year thereafter, OMES shall electronically issue an annual report to the President Pro Tempore of the Senate , the Speaker of the House of Representatives, and the Oklahoma Employees Insurance and Benefits Board not later than July 1 containing the following information regarding all state-administered plans: SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1272 SFLR Page 4 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1. Reserve amounts for the previous five (5) fiscal years; 2. Current operating expenses; 3. Premium rates for enrollees of each pla n for the previous five (5) plan years; 4. An explanation of all premium de creases, increases, and cost savings realized by enrollees for the current plan year; and 5. Any other information deemed necessary by the Board. SECTION 2. This act shall become effective July 1 , 2024. SECTION 3. It being immediately necessary for the preservation of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereb y declared to exist, by reason whereof thi s act shall take effect and be in full force from and after its passage an d approval. COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS February 28, 2024 - DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS