Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1272 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/15/2024

                     
 
SB1272 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) 
 
ENGROSSED SENATE 
BILL NO. 1272 	By: McCortney of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Sneed of the House 
 
 
 
 
[ Oklahoma Employees Insurance and Benefits Act - 
Reserve Fund - approval - notification - reporting - 
effective date -  
 	emergency ] 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOP LE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     74 O.S. 2021, Section 1312, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 1312.  (1) A. Except as otherwise provided by law, all 
employee and employer contributions, appropriations and dividend 
payments related to the health and dental plans administered by the 
Director of the Office of Management and Enterprise Services (OMES) 
shall be deposited in a fund in the State Treasury which is hereby 
created and which shall be known as the Health and Dental Insurance 
Reserve Fund “Health and Dental Insurance Reserve Fund ”.  The money 
in such fund shall be invested by the Oklahoma Employees In surance 
and Benefits Board in the manner specified in Section 1305.1 of this   
 
SB1272 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
title.  Investment income of the fund shall be added to the fund.  
Money payable to the claims administrator and all expenses in 
connection with the plans shall be paid from the f und.  The Board 
shall have responsibility for management of the fund. 
(2) B. All monies in the Health an d Dental Insurance Reserve 
Fund that are reserves for the life insurance plan administered by 
the Office OMES shall be transferred to the Life Insuranc e Reserve 
Fund on July 1, 1989. 
C.  1.  For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025, and each 
fiscal year thereafter, OMES shall maintain and record the internal 
benchmark for funds necessary to operate the state -administered 
plans to be held in the Health and Dental Insurance Reserve Fund. 
2.  For the purposes of this section, “internal benchmark” means 
the National Association of Insurance Commissioners recommended 
calculation for risk -based capital plus the previous ten (10) years ’ 
average for claims and in vestment losses. 
D. 1.  Any funds in excess of the limitations set forth in 
subsection C of this section shall be spent to lower premiums and 
health insurance costs pursuant to the schedule prescribed in 
paragraph 2 of this subsection .  A clear and concis e statement of 
how cost savings are implemented for the plan year shall be provided 
to all enrollees.   
 
SB1272 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  Funds in excess of the internal benchmark shall be spent in 
accordance with paragraph 1 of this subsection pursuant to the 
following schedule: 
a. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2025, twenty 
percent (20%) of the monies exceeding the reported 
internal benchmark, 
b. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2026, forty 
percent (40%) of the monies exceeding the reported 
internal benchmark, 
c. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2027, sixty 
percent (60%) of the monies excee ding the reported 
internal benchmark, 
d. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2028, eighty 
percent (80%) of the monies exceeding the reported 
internal benchmark, and 
e. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2029, and each 
plan year thereafter, one hundred percent (100%) of 
the monies exceeding the reported internal benchmark. 
E.  Beginning January 1, 2026, and each year thereafter, OMES 
shall electronically issue an annual report to the President Pro 
Tempore of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Rep resentatives, 
and the Oklahoma Employees Insurance and Benefits Board not later 
than July 1 containing the following information regarding all 
state-administered plans:   
 
SB1272 HFLR 	Page 4 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
1.  Reserve amounts for the previous five (5) fiscal years; 
2.  Current operating expenses ; 
3.  Premium rates for enr ollees of each plan for the previous 
five (5) plan years; 
4.  An explanation of all premium decreases, increases, and cost 
savings realized by enrollee s for the current plan year ; and 
5.  Any other information deemed necessary by the Board. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2024. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall tak e effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS AND BUDGET, dated 
04/11/2024 - DO PASS, As Amended.