ENGR. H. A. to ENGR. S. B. NO. 1272 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 ENGROSSED HOUSE AMENDME NT TO ENGROSSED SENATE BILL NO . 1272 By: McCortney of the Senate and Sneed of the House [ Oklahoma Employees Insurance and Benefits Act - Reserve Fund - approval - notification - reporting - effective date - emergency ] AMENDMENT NO. 1. Page 1, line 10, strike the enacting clause Passed the House of Representatives the 17th day of April, 2024. Presiding Officer of the House of Representatives Passed the Senate the ____ day of _______ ___, 2024. Presiding Officer of the Senate ENGR. S. B. NO. 1272 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 ENGROSSED SENATE BILL NO. 1272 By: McCortney of the Senate and Sneed of the House [ Oklahoma Employees Insurance and Benefits Act - Reserve Fund - approval - notification - reporting - effective date - emergency ] BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOP LE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 74 O.S. 2021, Section 1312, is amended to read as follows: Section 1312. (1) A. Except as otherwise provided by law, all employee and employer cont ributions, appropriations and dividend payments related to the health and dental plans administered by the Director of the Office of Management and Enterprise Services (OMES) shall be deposited in a fund in the State Treasury which is hereby created and which shall be known as the Health and Dental Insurance Reserve Fund “Health and Dental Insurance Reserve Fund ”. The money in such fund shall be invested by the Oklahoma Employees Insurance and Benefits Board in the manner specified in Section 1305.1 of thi s title. Investment income of the fund shall be added to the fund. Money payable to the claims administrator and all expenses in ENGR. S. B. NO. 1272 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 connection with the plans shall be paid from the fund. The Board shall have responsibility for management of the fund. (2) B. All monies in the Health an d Dental Insurance Reserve Fund that are reserves for the life insurance plan administered by the Office OMES shall be transferred to the Life Insurance Reserve Fund on July 1, 1989. C. 1. For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025, and each fiscal year thereafter, OMES shall maintain and record the internal benchmark for funds necessary to operate the state -administered plans to be held in the Health and Dental Insurance Reserve Fund. 2. For the purposes of this section, “internal benchmark” means the National Association of Insurance Commissioners recommended calculation for risk -based capital plus the previous ten (10) years ’ average for claims and investment losses. D. 1. Any funds in excess of the limitations set forth i n subsection C of this section shall be spent to lower premiums and health insurance costs pursuant to the schedule prescribed in paragraph 2 of this subsection . A clear and concise statement of how cost savings are implemented for the plan year shall be provided to all enrollees. 2. Funds in excess of the internal benchmark shall be spent in accordance with paragraph 1 of this subsection pursuant to the following schedule: ENGR. S. B. NO. 1272 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 a. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2025, twenty percent (20%) of the monies exceeding the reported internal benchmark, b. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2026, forty percent (40%) of the monies exceeding the reported internal benchmark, c. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2027, sixty percent (60%) of the monies excee ding the reported internal benchmark, d. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2028, eighty percent (80%) of the monies exceeding the reported internal benchmark, and e. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2029, and each plan year thereafter, one hundr ed percent (100%) of the monies exceeding the reported internal benchmark. E. Beginning January 1, 2026, and each year thereafter, OMES shall electronically issue an annual report to the President Pro Tempore of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Rep resentatives, and the Oklahoma Employees Insurance and Benefits Board not later than July 1 containing the following information regarding all state-administered plans: 1. Reserve amounts for the previous five (5) fiscal years; 2. Current operating expen ses; ENGR. S. B. NO. 1272 Page 4 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 3. Premium rates for enr ollees of each plan for the previous five (5) plan years; 4. An explanation of all premium decreases, increases, and cost savings realized by enrollees for the current plan year ; and 5. Any other information deemed necessary by the Board. SECTION 2. This act shall become effective July 1, 2024. SECTION 3. It being immediately necessary for the preservation of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby declared to exist, by rea son whereof this act shall tak e effect and be in full force from and after its passage and approval. Passed the Senate the 1 4th day of March, 2024. Presiding Officer of the Senate Passed the House of Representatives the ____ day of __________, 2024. Presiding Officer of the House of Representatives