Senate | 02/28/2024 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Pugh | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | First Reading |