Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1324 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 14, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2024

Amended

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024