Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1330 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/20/2024

                     
 
Req. No. 3449 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
SENATE BILL 1330 	By: Treat 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma Department of 
Agriculture, Food, and Forestry; creating the 
Oklahoma City National Memorial Education Revolving 
Fund; making an appropriation; providing for 
expenditures; providing purpose of fund; providing 
for codification; providing an effective date; and 
declaring an emergency. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEO PLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 2-34 of Title 2, unless there is 
created a duplication in numbering , reads as follows: 
There is hereby created in the Stat e Treasury a revolving fund 
for the Oklahoma Department of Agriculture, Food , and Forestry to be 
designated the “Oklahoma City National Memorial Education Revolving 
Fund”. The fund shall be a continuing fund, not subject to fiscal 
year limitations, and shall consist of all monies received by the 
Oklahoma Department of Agriculture, Food , and Forestry from 
legislative appropriations for the purpose of providing curriculum 
materials and instruction on the April 19, 1995, Alfred P. Murrah   
 
Req. No. 3449 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Federal Building bombing to students in th is state. All monies 
accruing to the credit of the fund are hereby appro priated and may 
be expended by the Oklahoma Department of Agriculture, Food , and 
Forestry for the purpose provided for in this section . 
Expenditures from the fund shall be made upon warrants issued by 
the State Treasurer against claims filed as prescribed by law with 
the Director of the Office of Management and Enterprise Services for 
approval and payment. 
SECTION 2.  There is hereby appropriated to the Oklahoma City 
National Memorial Education Revolving Fund from any monies not 
otherwise appropriated from the General Revenue F und of the State 
Treasury for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025, the sum of One 
Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ( $1,500,000.00) or so much 
thereof as necessary for the purpose of providing curriculum 
materials and instru ction on the April 19, 1995, Alfred P. Murrah 
Federal Building bombing to Oklahoma stu dents. 
SECTION 3.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2024. 
SECTION 4.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof thi s act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
59-2-3449 LG 2/20/2024 11:44:12 AM