Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1330 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 14, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024

Amended

Bill April 5, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 20, 2024