House | 04/11/2024 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) |