Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
SCs named Seifried, Pugh, Green, Deevers, Paxton, Pemberton, Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Swope
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative McBride
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Hefner (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Seifried
|
|
|